Medeiros v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wilhelmine Medeiros
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association, EnerBank USA and Bank of the West, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06338
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 29, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on Equifax's motion to dismiss is continued to April 28, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 10, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 20, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX, INC. AND BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings are continued to April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medeiros v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmine Medeiros
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Raymond WIlliam Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnerBank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?