Perkins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Janet Perkins
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Sterling Jewelers, Inc. and Credit First, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv06347
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Motions terminated: 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/06/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
August 25, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS EQUIFAX, INC. Equifax, Inc. terminated. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/25/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 16, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING ASIDE ORDER STRIKING AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
July 21, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The Case Management Conference in this case, scheduled for August 11, 2017, is vacated. In the event a dismissal has not been filed by September 5, 2017, the parties are directed to file, no later than that date, a report apprising the Court of the status of the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/21/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 17, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Plaintiff is ordered to submit a chambers copy of her amended complaint no later than July 24, 2017, and is advised that if no chamber copy is submitted by that date, the amended complaint will be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 23, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EQUIFAX'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file an amended pleading, such amended complaint shall be filed no later than July 7 , 2017. In light thereof, the Case Management Conference is continued from July 14, 2017, to August 11, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 2, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 16, 2017, to July 14, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 15, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing scheduled for May 19, 2017 on defendant Equifax's motion to dismiss is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 24, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The hearing on Equifax's motion to dismiss is continued to Friday May 19, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 29, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on Equifax's motion to dismiss is continued to April 28, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 10, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 20, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX, INC.'s MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing is continued to April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 10, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING EXTENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANY MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. will answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than February 28, 20 17. If Experian files a motion to dismiss the complaint, plaintiff shall oppose said motion no later than 30 days from the date upon which said motion is filed, and Experian shall file a reply no later than 21 days from the date upon which said opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 5, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for February 3, 2017, is continued to May 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 6, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING EXTENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANY MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. will answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than February 1, 2017. If Experian files a motion to dismiss the complaint, plaintiff shall oppose said motion no later than 30 days from the date upon which said motion is filed, and Experian shall file a reply no later than 21 days from the date upon which said opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/6/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 18, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/18/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 10, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit First, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?