Sierra v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mary Sierra
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv06352
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Mary Sierra. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 4, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/16/2017 at 5:00 PM. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
June 14, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Equifax, Inc. filed by Mary Sierra. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 26, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Mary Sierra. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sierra
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Rebecca Snavely Saelao
Represented By: Ivette Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?