Fontana v. The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Fontana
Defendant: The Chefs' Warehouse Inc. and Del Monte Capitol Meat Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06521
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 20 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
February 6, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
December 29, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Motion to Appear by Telephone At The Case Management Conference Set for February 14, 2017. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontana v. The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Fontana
Represented By: Sarah S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chefs' Warehouse Inc.
Represented By: Michele Jane Beilke
Represented By: Julia Yenha Trankiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Capitol Meat Company, LLC
Represented By: Michele Jane Beilke
Represented By: Julia Yenha Trankiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?