Fleming v. Impax Laboratories Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Greg Fleming
Defendant: Impax Laboratories Inc., George Frederick Wilkinson, Larry Hsu and Bryan M. Reasons
Case Number: 3:2016cv06557
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. Turner. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
February 15, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL, AND SETTING DEADLINES FOR FILING AND SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/15/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
November 15, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lieberman, Jeremy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Impax Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Fleming
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Frederick Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan M. Reasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?