Torres v. Saba et al
Plaintiff: Mario Torres
Defendant: Natalie Saba, Kira Murray, Christopher Martin, Elizabeth Harrigan, Robin Lipetzky, Office of Public Defenders, Scott Cunnane, Mark Peterson, Office of the District Attorney, Joe Battle, David Henley, Probation Office, Mike Nansen, Daniel Smith, Concord Chief of Police, Concord Police Dept., Officeer Name Unknown, Offfice of Internal Affairs, Bruce Mills, Cheryl Mills, Diane Becton, Clare Maier, Terri Mockler, Nancy Stark, Trevor White, Monica Poppen, Debbie Keys, Michele Peliollini, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County Superior Court, Governer of State of California, California Attorney General, Office of Attorney General, State of California and U.S.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06607
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER DENYING POST-TRIAL MOTIONS; GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS; AND SCHEDULING MARCH 8, 2024 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR TRIAL SETTING denying 275 Motion to Set Aside Verdict; denying 276 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 277 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting 280 Motion. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO A DECEMBER 6, 2023 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTGRATE JUDGE SPERO AND SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE FOR DECEMBER 15, 2023 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 VERDICT FORM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/13/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 VERDICT - COURT DRAFT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (COURT DRAFT November 7, 2023) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/7/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REOPEN DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) on 10/11/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Emailed document directly to Plaintiff and placed for mailing on 10/11/2023 Modified on 10/11/2023 (ec, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AS MOOT AND RE: REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION in case 3:16-cv-06607-SI; finding as moot (11) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 3:23-cv-04276-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/19/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Hard copy placed to be mailed on 9/19/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER RELATING CASE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/29/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), Torres v. McDonnell, 23-cv-04276, is referred to the Honorable Susan Illston for consideration of whether it is related to Torres v. Hansen, 16-cv-06607-SI. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/25/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/7/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Pretrial Instructions)(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER REOPENING CASE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 3PM ON OCTOBER 28, 2022 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE A STATUS STATEMENT APRIL 14, 2022 AN EVERY 90 DAYS THEREAFTER; ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 14, 2022 AT 3:OO PM granting 171 Administrative Motion. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S JANUARY 8, 2021 FILING finding as moot 149 Motion to Continue. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 124 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Robert Illman on 12/12/2019. The clerk hereby certifies that on a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the docket. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DISCOVERY ORDER denying 113 Motion to Compel. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Mario Torres. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER 24 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PARTIAL LEAVE TO AMEND 10 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT 2 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Saba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kira Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Lipetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Public Defenders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cunnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Nansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officeer Name Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offfice of Internal Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Becton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Mockler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Poppen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Keys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Peliollini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governer of State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?