Little Wishes v. Little Wish Foundation

Plaintiff: Little Wishes
Defendant: Little Wish Foundation
Case Number: 3:2016cv06613
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/27/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 20, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/20/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
August 15, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME RE DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATES. The non-expert discovery cutoff is continued from November 13, 2017, to February 12, 2018; the deadline for designation of experts is continued from December 11, 2017, to January 15, 2018; the deadline for designation of rebuttal experts is continued from January 12, 2018, to February 12, 2018; and the expert discovery cutoff is continued from February 2, 2018, to March 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
May 30, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; VACATING HEARING. The June 30, 2017 hearing before the undersigned is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/30/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 8, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint no later than May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 24, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file its proposed First Amended Complaint no later than April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 18, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/17/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
February 24, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 27, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STNADING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 24, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for February 24, 2017, is continued to March 31, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 4, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 22, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Wishes v. Little Wish Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Wishes
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Wish Foundation
Represented By: Stuart E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?