Metter v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Julian Metter
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06652
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 40 Uber's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 17, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT UBER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Richard Seeborg, denying 25 Motion to Compel. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
January 9, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metter v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Metter
Represented By: Lee Adam Cirsch
Represented By: Francis J. Flynn, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Friedl
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Lucia X. Roibal
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Represented By: Claudia Maria Vetesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?