Cree, Inc. v. Maxbrite LED Lighting Technology, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cree, Inc.
Defendant: Maxbrite LED Lighting Technology, LLC and John Anh Le
Case Number: 3:2016cv06689
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT MAXBRITE LED LIGHTING TECHNOLOGY LLC AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/7/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
February 8, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
December 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation, filed by Maxbrite LED Lighting Technology, LLC, Cree, Inc., John Anh Le. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cree, Inc. v. Maxbrite LED Lighting Technology, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cree, Inc.
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxbrite LED Lighting Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anh Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?