Damiana v. Cordis Corporation

Plaintiff: Gary Damiana
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv06742
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
April 3, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 16 JOINT STIPULATION TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES PENDING RESOLUTION OF JURISDICTIONAL ISSUE IN THE CASES RELATED UNDER DUNSON - The parties shall notify this court when the Ninth Circuit has made a decision regarding the CAFA jurisdiction issue on appeal in the mass action. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2017 02:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
January 27, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as modified, 14 STIPULATION. Further Case Management Conference continued to 4/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damiana v. Cordis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Damiana
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?