Warne v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Joel Jennings Warne
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Regents of the University of California, Andrea Gail Tenner, Stephen Gomez, Karen Smith, Medical Board of California and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 3:2016cv06773
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Deposition; Request for Sanctions 323 . (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/15/2017.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER FOLLOWING DECEMBER 7, 2017 HEARING(Re: Dkt. Nos. 195, 213, 220, 222, 233, 234, 239, 241, 242, 252, 253, 254, 255, 274, 275.) Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 8, 2017. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE: SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on September 29, 2017. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 179 RENEWED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE: DOCKET NOS. 140, 141, AND 155. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/22/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 135 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/11/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warne v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Jennings Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Mark David Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Jessica Julia Hansen
Represented By: Marc Novak Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Gail Tenner
Represented By: Jessica Julia Hansen
Represented By: Marc Novak Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Board of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?