Twilio, Inc. v. Telesign Corporation

Plaintiff: Twilio, Inc.
Defendant: Telesign Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv06925
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 121 TELESIGN'S MOTION TO COMPEL AMENDED DAMAGES CONTENTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/17/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 13, 2017 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIM TERMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,306,021; 8,837,465; AND 8,755,376. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 13, 2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
September 1, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 104 TELESIGN'S OBJECTIONS TO TWILIO'S AMENDED INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/1/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 29, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Striking Claim Terms Briefed in Violation of Patent Local Rule 4-3 and Court Order. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 18, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 93 TELESIGN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/18/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
April 17, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Specifically Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to U.S. Patent Nos. 8,738,051 and 9,226,217. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 5, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/5/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 31, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for U.S. Patent Nos. 8,306,021; 8,837,465; 8,755,376; 8,737,962; and 9,270,833. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twilio, Inc. v. Telesign Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twilio, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Jay Bayard Schiller
Represented By: Wayne O. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telesign Corporation
Represented By: Mayela C Montenegro
Represented By: Mary Jane Peal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?