JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC v. Bronco Wine Company et al

Plaintiff: JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC
Defendant: Bronco Wine Company, Classic Wines of California, Barrel Ten Quarter Circle, Inc. and Panther Rock Wines, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06953
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
July 13, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 TO SUSPEND PROCEEDINGS AND STAY ALL DEADLINES filed by JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC. Status Report due by 9/14/2017. Status Conference set for 9/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 6, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC v. Bronco Wine Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronco Wine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Wines of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrel Ten Quarter Circle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panther Rock Wines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC Waugh Wine Co. LLC
Represented By: Joy Louise Durand
Represented By: Christopher James Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?