Asetek Danmark A/S v. Newegg Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Asetek Danmark A/S
Defendant: Newegg Inc. and Newegg North America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07068
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Amend Case Schedule; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
April 25, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Model Stipulation & Proposed Order re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
March 29, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Amend Case Schedule; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Stipulated ESI order or competing proposed ESI orders due 4/28/2017. Infringement Con tentions & Accompanying Production 5/15/2017. Invalidity Contentions & Accompanying Production 5/30/2017. Exchange of Terms for Construction 6/13/2017. Exchange of Preliminary Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence 8/4/2017. Damages Contentions 8/8 /2017. Joint Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement 8/15/2017. Deadline to amend the pleadings 8/15/2017. Responsive Damages Contentions 9/7/2017. Claim construction discovery cut-off 9/14/2017. Aseteks Opening Claim Construction Brief 9/22/2 017. Neweggs Responsive Claim Construction Brief 10/6/2017. Aseteks Reply Claim Construction Brief 10/13/2017. Claim Construction Hearing set for 11/7/2107 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 6, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asetek Danmark A/S v. Newegg Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek Danmark A/S
Represented By: Arpita Bhattacharyya
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Erik Raymond Puknys
Represented By: Jacob Adam Schroeder
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg Inc.
Represented By: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?