U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Coimmission
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc. and Calidad Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07093
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2018 75 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE/JUDGMENT. Final decree of this Court in full settlement of this action. This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees. The Court retains jurisidiction of this matter for purposes of enforcing the Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
October 27, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF CHRISTOPHER GREEN re 32 Discovery Letter Brief re Depo of Christopher Green filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/27/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
March 21, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/21/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calidad Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Coimmission
Represented By: Linda Susan Ordonio-Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?