Williams v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn Williams
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv07152
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (53 in 3:17-cv-00661-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Company, (97 in 3:16-cv-07152-JST) STIPULATION WITH PR OPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
September 28, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (90 in 3:16-cv-07152-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, McKesso n Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, (47 in 3:17-cv-00661-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
August 7, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS PURSUANT TO N.D. CAL. CIV. L.R. 6-1 filed by Carolyn Williams. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
March 22, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 20, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-661.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 20, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Okoye v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Case No. 17-668. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/13/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Williams
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Robert Adam Mosier
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?