Stevens et al v. Jiffy Lube International, Inc.

Petitioner: Randy Stevens and Elissa Stevens
Respondent: Jiffy Lube International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07175
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 25 29 Petitioners' Motion for New Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Alter or Amend the Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 20, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION for New Judgment.< Motion Hearing reset from 4/13/2017 to 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Vacatur of Arbitration Award. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 6, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 Case Management Scheduling Order and 2 MOTION to Vacate 1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Arbitraiton Award. Motion Hearing reset for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Fran cisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Jiffy Lube International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Stevens
Represented By: Vincent M. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elissa Stevens
Represented By: Vincent M. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jiffy Lube International, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Kim Clancy
Represented By: Robert D. Eassa
Represented By: Michael Louis Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Koonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?