Espinosa v. Bluemercury, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Espinosa
Defendant: Bluemercury, Inc. and Macy's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07202
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Dismissal filed by Bluemercury, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 23, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Answer and/or Otherwise Respond filed by Bluemercury, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 31, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Bluemercury, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Amended Pleadings or Dismissal due by 8/11/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
March 22, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AND DENYING IT IN PART by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinosa v. Bluemercury, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Espinosa
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluemercury, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?