Calip v. Ciox Health, LLC

Plaintiff: Nytasia Calip
Defendant: Ciox Health, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv07231
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Dates Due to Parties' Mediation filed by Ciox Health, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 12/18/2017. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/ 20/2017 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2017. Not less than 24 prior to the conference, email one number at which all attorneys can be reached to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 13, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ciox Health, LLC filed by Ciox Health, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 4, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Ciox Health, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calip v. Ciox Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nytasia Calip
Represented By: Daniel F. Gaines
Represented By: Evan S. Gaines
Represented By: Kennith S. Gaines
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciox Health, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Bils
Represented By: Shareef Swamy Farag
Represented By: Julie Kwun
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?