Whitsitt v. West Valley Staffing Group et al

Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Defendant: West Valley Staffing Group and Tesla Motors
Case Number: 3:2016cv07234
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/26/17. mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 4, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Should plaintiff wish to proceed with the instant action, he must, no later than April 21, 2017, (1) pay the filing fee to the Clerk of the Court or file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) file a corrected version of his complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
February 8, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with the instant action, plaintiff must, no later than February 24, 2017, (1) pay the filing fee or file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis that clarifies each of the inconsistencies referenced in this order and (2) file a corrected version of his complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to May 26, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with the instant action, plaintiff must, no later than February 24, 2017 , (1) pay the filing fee or file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis that clarifies each of the inconsistencies referenced in this order and (2) file a corrected version of his complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to May 26, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitsitt v. West Valley Staffing Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley Staffing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?