Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. v. Mata et al
Plaintiff: Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc.
Defendant: Jinny Lynn Mata, Gabe Joseph Mata and AAAC Support Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv07268
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Inyo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 62 Stipulation filed by Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Staying Case until October 30, 2017 filed by Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 selecting Private ADR by Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. (Stipulation for Removal From Court-Sponsored Mediation and [proposed] Order) filed by Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 19 Defendant AAAC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/8/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference and Stay. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/25/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17, 16th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc. v. Mata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pestmaster Franchise Network, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinny Lynn Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabe Joseph Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAAC Support Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?