Oldham v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christina Oldham
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv07296
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Christina Oldham. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
June 5, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal for Trans Union LLC Only filed by Christina Oldham. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
March 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Mediation by Trans Union LLC filed by Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oldham v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Oldham
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Golden
Represented By: Cory M Teed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Terri R Brown
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?