The Regents of the University of California v. Chen et al

Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Defendant: Roger Jinteh Arrigo Chen and Genia Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07396
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2018 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 TO (1) RE-SET STATUS CONFERENCE AND (2) EXTEND DEADLINES IN CONNECTION WITH (A) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO JOIN OXFORD NANOPORE TECHNOLOGIES, AND (B) DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDE R SE filed by The Regents of the University of California. Responses due by 7/20/2018. Replies due by 8/3/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 7/12/2018. Status Conference set for 7/19/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
April 27, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 86 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 18, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, resetting 87 MOTION to Join Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc. and Status Conference. Status Report due by 6/21/2018. Status Conference reset from 5/24/2018 to 6/28/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing reset for 6/28/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/25/2018. Replies due by 6/8/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 3, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 to Modify Deadlines Under Case Management Order filed by The Regents of the University of California Discovery due by 7/2/2018. Status Report due by 5/17/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2 018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 5/24/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
January 29, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Litigation filed by The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/29/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
September 22, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 - Joint Stipulated Protective Order and [Proposed] Order filed by The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 25, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 To Extend Deadline For Defendants To File Answers To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed by Genia Technologies, Inc., Roger Jinteh Arrigo Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
July 26, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 53 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
April 18, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Roger Jinteh Arrigo Chen, Genia Technologies, Inc. and The Regents of the University of California filed by Genia Technologies, Inc., Roger Jinteh Arrigo Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
March 30, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 (1) Rescheduling Case Management Conference; and (2) Setting Deadlines to File Motion to Dismiss, Briefing Schedule, and to Hold Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Genia Technologies, Inc., Roger Jinteh Arr igo Chen. Motions terminated: 30 MOTION to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2017. Motion and Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 7, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 RENEWED STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
February 14, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/14/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California v. Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Ariel D. House
Represented By: Paul R. Morico
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Jinteh Arrigo Chen
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genia Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?