Stierwalt v. Associated Third Party Administrators et al

Petitioner: Richard Stierwalt
Respondent: Associated Third Party Administrators and United Benefits & Pension Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016mc80059
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 29 , 30 Defendant and Third Parties' Motion to Alter Judgment. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 2, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 38 Notice (Other) filed by CAMOFI Master LDC, CAMHZN Master LDC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Alter Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Associated Third Party Administrators to Alter, Amend and/or Reconsider Judgment Pursuan t to F.R.C.P. Rule 59(e), or in the Alternative, for Relief fr, 29 MOTION to Alter Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Associated Third Party Administrators to Alter, Amend and/or Reconsider Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 59(e), or in the Alternative, for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 60(b. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/7/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
May 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER re Third-Party Claim of Security Interest. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/25/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Third-Party Claim of Security Interest. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 23, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Joint Letter of May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/23/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 2, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 re continuance of hearing on petition filed by Richard Stierwalt. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 22, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 4 Petitioner's Petition for Hearing to Determine Validity of Third-Party Claim of Security Interest. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 20, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/20/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stierwalt v. Associated Third Party Administrators et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Stierwalt
Represented By: Jason Mattson Flom
Represented By: Eric Andrew Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Associated Third Party Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United Benefits & Pension Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?