In re: Subpoena to Sigma Designs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Defendant: Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Envision Peripherals, Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp. and Vizio, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016mc80122
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/3/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
June 17, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 10, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 MOTION to Transfer Enforcement of Rule 45 Subpoena to the Issuing Court, or alternatively, for this Court to Enforce the Subpoena against Sigma filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Proof of Service to be filed by June 15, 2016. Any opposition is due within seven (7) days after the proof of service is filed. No reply brief shall be permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/10/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Subpoena to Sigma Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Arun S. Subramanian
Represented By: Meng Xi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPV Int'l (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Peripherals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPV Technology Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?