In the Matter of the Search of Content Stored at Premises Controlled by Google Inc. and as Further Described in Attachment A

Movant: Google Inc.
Miscellaneous: United States of Amreica
Case Number: 3:2016mc80263
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING GOOGLE IN CIVIL CONTEMPT AND DENYING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
August 14, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying 47 Google's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 79 motion to continue hearing. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/14/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
April 25, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. The attached amended order adds a line to the Rule 41(b) analysis on page 5 to account for the 2016 amendment adding Rule 41(b)(6) and otherwise is unchanged. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 19, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING GOOGLE'S MOTION QUASH WARRANT FOR CONTENT THAT IT STORES OUTSIDE THE UNITED STATES. The attached order denies Google's motion to quash the warrant for content that it stores outside the United States and orders it to produce all content responsive to the search warrant that is retrievable from the United States, regardless of the data's actual location. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/19/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Search of Content Stored at Premises Controlled by Google Inc. and as Further Described in Attachment A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Hinnen
Represented By: Julie Erin Schwartz
Represented By: John Randall Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: United States of Amreica
Represented By: Merry Jean Chan
Represented By: William Frentzen
Represented By: Kathryn R. Haun
Represented By: Andrew Sun Pak
Represented By: Catherine Alden Pelker
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?