Ferrari, et al v. Autobahn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steve Ferrari, Mike Keynejad, Patricia Rubin, Hooshang Jowza, Celso Frazao, Renuka Narayan, Gertrud Frankrone, Ernest Salinas, Kalkhusan Sareen, Hossein Jalali, Ron Wolfe, Sohrab Rahimzadeh, Fred Grant, Ester Grant, Vincent Leung, Ken Wong, Jessica Langridge, Tony Nicolosi, Donald Lyang, Artur Semichev, John Diaz, Harold Fethe and Ray Gapasin
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Speedway Motorsports, Inc., Sonic Automotive, Inc. and Autobahn, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00018
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 187 Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Recipient. The 10/22/2019 hearing date is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC TO DISMISS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 163 Motion to Dismiss; denying 183 Motion for Leave to File. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER STRIKING PROPOSED FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MOTION TO DISMISS SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND re 178 Notice of filing Redline of Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Steve Ferrari. Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2019. Defendant MBUSA reply filed 3/11/19. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PARTIAL JUDGMENT ENTERED PURSUANT TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Except as provided in the Court's Order, Dkt. no. 176, this action is Dismissed with Prejudice and plaintiffs shall take nothing by their complaint against defendants Autobahn Inc. dba Autobahn Motors and Sonic Automotive, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINIARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLAIMS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 136 Motion to Certify Class; granting 136 Motion for Settlement; gra nting 156 Stipulation. Final Approval Motion filed by 12/11/2018. Final Approval hearing set for 1/15/2019 02:00 PM. File Motion for Attorney Fees by 9/27/2018. Attorneys Fees Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN AS FILED WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT OR WRITTEN CONSENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 6/8/2018 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEEDINGS TO PERMIT FURTHER MEDIATION [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Action stayed through 4/30/18. The 3/26/18 Case management conference is VACATED. Compliance hearing set 4/27/18 at 9:01AM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/26/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR STAY; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting [ 82] Motion to Compel; denying in part and granting in part with leave to amend 84 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants response filed no later than 2/27/2018. Revised Third Amended Complaint filed by 2/6/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/2/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF SMI TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari, et al v. Autobahn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Represented By: James Niles Tansey
Represented By: Helen Yiea Trac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway Motorsports, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Candice P Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Grant Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autobahn, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Grant Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ferrari
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Keynejad
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rubin
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hooshang Jowza
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Frazao
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renuka Narayan
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrud Frankrone
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Salinas
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalkhusan Sareen
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossein Jalali
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Wolfe
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sohrab Rahimzadeh
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Grant
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Grant
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Leung
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Wong
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Langridge
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Nicolosi
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lyang
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artur Semichev
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Diaz
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Fethe
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Gapasin
Represented By: Elizabeth Betowski
Represented By: Herman Franck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?