Fitbit, Inc. v. Laguna 2, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fitbit, Inc.
Defendant: Laguna 2, LLC, Joel Blank, Cali Resources, Inc. and Carlos Kelvin
Case Number: 3:2017cv00079
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 99 101 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 15, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SECOND STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR MI TECH AND MERCHANT KING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Innovative Enterprises, Inc. dba The Merchant King, Amir Tafreshi, MI Technologies, Inc. dba Discount Merchant, Joubin Rahimi. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 8, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 Joint Stipulated Request and Proposed Order to Briefly Extend Deadline For Settlement Conference filed by Fitbit, Inc. Status Report due by 11/14/2017. Status Conference reset from 11/9/2017 to 11/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
July 28, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 to Extend Time for the L2 and Cali Defendants to Respond to Fitbit's Second Amended Complaint filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 14, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 To Extend Time For Fitbit To File Second Amended Complaint filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 re 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Extending Time For Fitbit To Respond filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 30, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 Stipulation filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 26, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 62 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 7, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 - [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 1, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 RE ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT CALI RESOURCES filed by Fitbit, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 24, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Deferring 42 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Granting 46 Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal; and Deferring Ruling on 50 Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 18, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Deferring in Part 12 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (TRO). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitbit, Inc. v. Laguna 2, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary J. Alinder
Represented By: Peter Michael Colosi
Represented By: Rebecca Keiko Felsenthal
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laguna 2, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Bartlett
Represented By: Sherman W. Kahn
Represented By: Marc J. Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Blank
Represented By: Jason R. Bartlett
Represented By: Sherman W. Kahn
Represented By: Marc J. Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cali Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Kelvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?