Chris Azpeitia et al v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chris Azpeitia, Antonio Garcia, Eileen Foster and Samantha Scott
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC and Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00123
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (49) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:17-cv-00123-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
July 21, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
April 28, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Second Amended Complaint filed by Samantha West, Chris Azpeitia, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 25, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Samantha West, Chris Azpeitia, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Azpeitia et al v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Azpeitia
Represented By: Cornelia Dai
Represented By: Randy R. Renick
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Joshua Finley Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Garcia
Represented By: Cornelia Dai
Represented By: Randy R. Renick
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Joshua Finley Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Foster
Represented By: Cornelia Dai
Represented By: Randy R. Renick
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Joshua Finley Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Scott
Represented By: Cornelia Dai
Represented By: Randy R. Renick
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Joshua Finley Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?