Bestway (USA), Inc. et al v. SGROMO et al
Plaintiff: Bestway (USA), Inc., Bestway (Hong Kong) International Ltd. and Bestway Inflatables and Material Corporation
Defendant: Pietro Pasquale-Antonio Sgromo, Wagmore & Barkless LLC, Leonard Gregory Scott and Eureka Inventions LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00205
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 175 Administrative Motion Designate Recipient of the Distribution of Royalty Payment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Motion to Relate Case to Case No. 19-cv-8170-KAW. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 160 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Artz, John. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/18/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 138 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE ( 85 , 89 and 126 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL; TERMINATING AS MOOT 92 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (This order grants in part and denies in part docket no. 99 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 130 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING 113 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/27/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING 119 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/25/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kraus, William. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/26/2018 10:00 AM and Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/13/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Administrative Motion for an Extension of Time to File Proposed Order and Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 82 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; GRANTING 79 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(This order terminates docket no. 73 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS ( granting in part and denying in part 21 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 32 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 33 Motion to Transfer Case and denying as moot 36 Administrative Motion ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Nitin Gambhir terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/16/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference Presently Set for October 31, 2017. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2017; Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 14 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2017; Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bestway (USA), Inc. et al v. SGROMO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestway (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestway (Hong Kong) International Ltd.
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestway Inflatables and Material Corporation
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pietro Pasquale-Antonio Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagmore & Barkless LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Gregory Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Inventions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?