Avila v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Avila
Defendant: Bank of America, U.S. Bank, National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00222
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 83 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Stipulation to Further Extend Defendant's Response Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation Re Docket No. 66 Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. MOTIONS TO DISMISS.(Granting 32 , 35 , 39 Motions to Dismiss). Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DENYING 55 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Hearings on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Avila
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Flora S. Sarder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?