See v. Jennings et al

Defendant: David Jennings, Sarah R. Saldana, Jeh Johnson, Loretta Lynch and Scott R. Jones
Petitioner: Korng See
Case Number: 3:2017cv00225
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS MOOT. Re: Dkt. No. 1 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/19/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
March 21, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING MOOTNESS OF SEE'S HABEAS PETITION. Parties to file supplemental briefing by 3/28/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/21/2107. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 16, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. Nos. 1 , [1-3]. The government must file its response to See's petition by 2/22/2017. See must file a reply to the government's response by 2/27/2017. The Court will hold a hearing on See's petition 3/1/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/16/2017. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: See v. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jennings
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah R. Saldana
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Korng See
Represented By: Kevin Chun Hoi Lo
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?