Thomas et al v. County of Sonoma et al

Plaintiff: Gary Price Thomas and M. N. Thomas
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Louise Bayless-Fightmaster, James G. Bertoli, Nancy Case Shaffer, Clerk of the Superior Court, County of Sonoma, Jose Octavio Guillen, Sonoma County Family Court Services, Beth Wannamaker, Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services and Jennifer Obergfell
Case Number: 3:2017cv00245
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. A copy of 20 Order Rescheduling April 27, 2017 Motion Hearing is also included, because the copy previously sent to plaintiffs on 3/23/17 was returned as undeliverable by the US Post Office. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Motion. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
May 25, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; and denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment.The court grants the defendants' motions to dismiss fo r lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The court denies Mr. Thomas's summary-judgment motions. Because amendment would not cure the jurisdictional defects, the dismissal is without leave to amend. But it is also without prejudice to Mr. Thomas filing his claims (or appealing the state court's decisions) in state court. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Price Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Bayless-Fightmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Bertoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Case Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Superior Court, County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Octavio Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Family Court Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Wannamaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Obergfell
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?