Judith Anne Moloney v. Leon Rodriguez, et al

Plaintiff: Judith Anne Moloney
Defendant: Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez and Mark Hazuda
Case Number: 3:2017cv00303
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING RE 15 MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 24, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to dismiss motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction as Moot. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 23, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith Anne Moloney v. Leon Rodriguez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Raven Marie Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Raven Marie Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Raven Marie Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Anne Moloney
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?