Six4three, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC filed a complaint for an injunction and damages against Defendant Facebook, Inc. in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The complaint alleged that as a result of Facebook's decision to end access to Friends' Photos Endpoint, which permitted third-party developer access to a set of photos shared with a user by the user's friends, plaintiff suffered substantial injury including the loss of its investment in developing its Pikini app, which was to find photos of friends in bikinis.

Plaintiff: Six4three, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00359
Filed: January 24, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 38 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Remand Order. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 21, 2017 37 Certified Copy of Remand Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 36 SEALING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 35 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Remand.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 16, 2017 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 re 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. Motion to Remand is Granted. Motion for Award of Fess and Costs Taken Under Submission.Total Time in Court 12 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney David Godkin. Defendant Attorney Cat Kim; Sonal Mehta. This is a text only Minute Entry (dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 33 NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 32 Response re 31 Order bySix4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 31 REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal of 20 Opposition to Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC's Motion to Remand by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/15/2017) Modified on 2/16/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2017 29 Response re 28 Order Requesting Response from Plaintiff bySix4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE A SURREPLY AND REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 27 Declaration of Catherine Y. Kim in Support of 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 10, 2017 Electronic filing errors. Incorrect event used. [err101]Re: 23 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,Document not properly linked. [err102]Re: 23 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Six4three, LLC, 25 Declaration in Support, filed by Six4three, LLC, 24 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by Six4three, LLC Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 9, 2017 26 OBJECTIONS to Evidence in Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC's Reply 24 to its Motion to Remand by Facebook, Inc.. (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 9, 2017 25 REDACTED Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of 24 REPLY to 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Remand, filed by Six4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) filed bySix4three, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 4 REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit 7 REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit 8 REDACTED, # 9 Exhibit 9 REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # 11 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # 12 Exhibit 12 REDACTED, # 13 Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # 14 Exhibit 14 REDACTED, # 15 Exhibit 15 REDACTED, # 16 Exhibit 16 REDACTED, # 17 Exhibit 17 REDACTED, # 18 Exhibit 18 REDACTED, # 19 Exhibit 19 REDACTED)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/10/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/10/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 24 REDACTED REPLY (SEE ATTACHMENT) to 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, filed by Six4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/10/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2018: # 1 REDACTED REPLY) (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 23 Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of Plaintiff's 24 Reply to Defendant's 20 Opposition to Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Remand, filed by Six4three, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Errata 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 UNREDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 UNREDACED, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 5 UNREDACTGED, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 6 UNREDACTED, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 7 UNREDACTED, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 8 UNREDACTED, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 9 UNREDACTED, # 17 Exhibit 10, # 18 Exhibit 10 UNREDACTED, # 19 Exhibit 11, # 20 Exhibit 11 UNREDACTED, # 21 Exhibit 12, # 22 Exhibit 12 UNREDACTED, # 23 Exhibit 13, # 24 Exhibit 13 UNREDACTED, # 25 Exhibit 14, # 26 Exhibit 14 UNREDACTED, # 27 Exhibit 15, # 28 Exhibit 15 UNREDACTED, # 29 Exhibit 16, # 30 Exhibit 16 UNREDACTED, # 31 Exhibit 17, # 32 Exhibit 17 UNREDACTED, # 33 Exhibit 18, # 34 Exhibit 18 UNREDACTED, # 35 Exhibit 19, # 36 Exhibit 19 UNREDACTED)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/10/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Six4three, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Signed Protective Order, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Redacted Version of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Remand, # 5 Unredacted version of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Remand)(Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 7, 2017 21 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Mehta Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Mehta Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Mehta Decl.)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 31, 2017 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Six4three, LLC (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 18 STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING AND HEARING - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING AND HEARING re 14 . Responses due by 2/6/2017 AT NOON. Replies due by 2/9/2017 AT NOON. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/30/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) Modified on 1/31/2017 (dl, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2017 16 Proposed Order re 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 15 Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of 14 Stipulation to Shorten Time for Motion to Remand filed bySix4three, LLC. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 14 STIPULATION re 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 13 Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed bySix4three, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2017. Replies due by 2/17/2017. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Miller, Laura) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 10 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 4 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID S. GODKIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) Modified on 1/27/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2017 9 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 5 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. KRUZER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) Modified on 1/26/2017 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/27/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Y. Kim (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11102314.) filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11102275.) filed by Six4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Basil Peter Fthenakis As Counsel for Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC (Fthenakis, Basil) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 2 Case assigned to Hon. William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11098204) from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 533328. (). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Miller, Laura) (Filed on 1/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Six4three, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Six4three, LLC
Represented By: Basil Peter Fthenakis
Represented By: David S. Godkin
Represented By: James E. Kruzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Y. Kim
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?