Tidwell v. Carrington Real Estate Services (US), LLC et al

Plaintiff: Edward Cotrelle Tidwell
Defendant: Carrington Real Estate Services (US), LLC, Carrington Real Estate Services (CA) Inc., Contra Costa County Superior Court, State of California, United States Bankruptcy Court, Northern District of California, Michelle M. De Bord-Ridge, Debora Horne Snyder, Elizabeth M. Counts, Contra Costa County Office of the Sheriff, Naiman Law Group, Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLC, Carrington Holding Company, LLC, Carrington Real Estate Services, LLC, Carrington Holdings, Inc., Snyder Real Estate Group and Contra Costa County Office of the District Attorney
Case Number: 3:2017cv00437
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF EDWARD COTRELLE TIDWELL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 2, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 73 REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/2/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
June 29, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 48 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 8, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 40 45 MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
April 27, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 19 Motion to Dismiss]. Motion due by NOON on 5/11/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
February 13, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Carrington Real Estate Services (US), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Cotrelle Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Real Estate Services (US), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Real Estate Services (CA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bankruptcy Court, Northern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M. De Bord-Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Horne Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Office of the Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naiman Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Real Estate Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder Real Estate Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Office of the District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?