Adelson v. American Airlines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joel W. Adelson
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc. and British Airways, PLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00548
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 41 Motion to Amend/Correct]. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
May 26, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 39 Stipulation. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 24, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
April 17, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FORJUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, Motions terminated: 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Joel W. Adelson, 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Revised) filed by Joel W. Adelson. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/17/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 22 Stipulation]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adelson v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel W. Adelson
Represented By: Gerald Carey Sterns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott David Cunningham
Represented By: Todd Christopher Worthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?