City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust v. RH, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust
Defendant: RH, Inc., Gary Friedman and Karen Boone
Case Number: 3:2017cv00554
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PLAN OF ALLOCATION, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES [*As Modified by the Court*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER RE STIPULATED PRELIMINARY APPROVAL SCHEDULE; All pending deadlines are VACATED. Set/Reset Deadlines as to: Lead Plaintiff shall file Motion for Preliminary approval of proposed settlement by 5/6/2019. Any Opposition/Responses filed by 5/2 0/2019. Replies filed by 5/27/2019. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing set for 6/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CASE MANAGEMENT AND REVISED TRIAL ORDER. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/20/2019. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2019. Dispositive Motion filed by 6/11/2019. Opening Reports due by 4/5/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/6/2019. Replies due by 7/23/2019. Responses due by 7/9/2019. Status Report due by 10/18/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor bef ore Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filed by 11/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing is set for Frida y, 10/25/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/31/2019. THE COURT VACATES THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, FEBRUARY 4, 2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Discovery Order re: 115 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/10/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Notice of Referral for Discovery and Order re 115 Joint Discovery Letter. The Court sets a telephonic hearing on this letter brief for December 21, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall call the following phone number on that date: 1-888-684-8852/Passcode: 2925506. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit the disputed discovery material by noon on December 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/19/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/3/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 92 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related and ORDER RELATING CASES 17-cv-00554-YGR and 18-cv-02452-CRB. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/22/2019. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Opening Reports due by 3/1/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 4/1/2019. Class Certification motion filed 6/22/2018. Oppositio n filed 8/3/18. Reply filed 8/31/18. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert/Dispositive Motion filed by 5/14/2019. Responses due by 6/11/2019. R eplies due by 6/25/2019. Daubert/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC SCHOOL TEACHERS' PENSION AND RETIREMENT FUND OF CHICAGO AND ARKANSAS TEACHER RETIREMENT SYSTEM APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzale z Rogers; denying as moot (36) Stipulation; denying (7) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (11) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (15) Motion to Cons olidate Cases; denying (15) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 4:17-cv-00554-YGR; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 4:17-cv-01425-YGR. The Court VACATES the hearing set for May 10, 2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust v. RH, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RH, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?