Dorsaneo v. Dorsaneo

Plaintiff: Tetyana Dorsaneo
Defendant: Edward Matthew Dorsaneo
Case Number: 3:2017cv00765
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2018 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES 118 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/11/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
February 24, 2018 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/22/2018 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2018. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/24/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2018)
December 22, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS 69 , DENYING SANCTIONS, AND SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULE 73 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/22/2017. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsaneo v. Dorsaneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Matthew Dorsaneo
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Neustadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetyana Dorsaneo
Represented By: Jennifer Joy Panicker
Represented By: Jody Lloyd Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?