Hung V. Vu, D.D.S., A Professional Dental Corp. v. i Care Credit, LLC

Plaintiff: Hung V. Vu, D.D.S., A Professional Dental Corp.
Defendant: i Care Credit, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00790
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND VACATING HEARING [re 17 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 filed by i Care Credit, LLC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/22/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 20, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 17 MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (pursuant to 27 stipulation). Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 4, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hung V. Vu, D.D.S., A Professional Dental Corp. v. i Care Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung V. Vu, D.D.S., A Professional Dental Corp.
Represented By: Michael Hagop Boyamian
Represented By: Thomas Walker Falvey
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini
Represented By: Armand Raffi Kizirian
Represented By: Kristen-Leigh Myles
Represented By: Stephen Morton Rinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i Care Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?