Lagree Technologies, Inc. et al v. Spartacus 20th L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Lagree Technologies, Inc., Lagree Fitness, Inc., Maximum Fitness Incorporated and Sebastien Lagree
Defendant: Spartacus 20th L.P., Spartacus 20th G.P., Inc., Philip R. Palumbo, Jakob Irion, BodyROK Franchise, Limited Partnership, BodyROK Franchise GP, Inc., Exercise Technologies, L.P., BodyRok Marina, L.P. and Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00795
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE A SUR-REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AND RELATED C OUNTERCLAIMS PURSUANT TO FED.R. CIV. 41 filed by BodyRok Marina, L.P., BodyROK Franchise, Limited Partnership, Spartacus 20th L.P., Jakob Irion, Philip R. Palumbo, Spartacus Lombard, L.P., Spartacus 20th G.P., Inc., Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC, BodyROK Franchise GP, Inc., Exercise Technologies, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
August 28, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 79 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Claims and Related Counterclaims to Extend time to Reply filed by Maximum Fitness Incorporated, Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc., Lagree Technologies, Inc., Lagree Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 7, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Plaintiffs-Counterdefendants to Reply to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Claims and Related Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) and 12(b)(1) filed by Maximum Fitness Incorporated, Sebastien Lagree, Lagree Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 20, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for changing Hearing Time filed by Maximum Fitness Incorporated, Sebastien Lagree, Lagree Technologies, Inc., Lagree Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 15, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Counter-Defendants to Respond to Defendant's First Amended Counterclaims filed by Maximum Fitness Incorporated, Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc., Lagree Technologies, Inc., Lagree Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
April 17, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 24 Motion for Alternate Service. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 11, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to File Their Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by BodyRok Marina, L.P., BodyROK Franchise, Limited Partnership, Spartacu s 20th L.P., Jakob Irion, Philip R. Palumbo, Spartacus 20th G.P., Inc., Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC, BodyROK Franchise GP, Inc., Exercise Technologies, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagree Technologies, Inc. et al v. Spartacus 20th L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lagree Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Represented By: Paul Jen Loh
Represented By: Chad E Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lagree Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Represented By: Paul Jen Loh
Represented By: Chad E Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximum Fitness Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Represented By: Paul Jen Loh
Represented By: Chad E Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastien Lagree
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Represented By: Paul Jen Loh
Represented By: Chad E Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartacus 20th L.P.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartacus 20th G.P., Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip R. Palumbo
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakob Irion
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyROK Franchise, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyROK Franchise GP, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exercise Technologies, L.P.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyRok Marina, L.P.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?