Abdo et al v. Fitzsimmons et al
Plaintiff: John E. Abdo
Defendant: Michael Fitzsimmons, Peter Lai, Christopher G. Power, Peter J. Goetner, Christian Borcher, Ernest D. Del, Marc S. Yi, James C. Peters and Souheil S. Badran
Miscellaneous: Rising Tide I, LLC and Rising Tide II, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00851
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying (178) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:17-cv-00851-TSH; denying (179) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:17-cv-01232-TSH. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting (170) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and (179) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:17-cv-00851-TSH; granting (166) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and (174) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:17-cv-01232-TSH. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting (164) Motion to Strike in case 3:17-cv-00851-TSH; granting (161) Motion to Strike in case 3:17-cv-01232-TSH. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 117 Motion to Compel; granting 119 Motion for Joinder. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 117 Motion to Compel; granting 119 Motion for Joinder. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (100 in 3:17-cv-00851-EDL and 92 in 3:17-cv-01232-EDL) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Trial and Associated Deadlines filed by Souheil S. Badran, Christian Borcher, Peter Lai, Michael Fitzsimmons, Mar c S. Yi, Christopher G. Power, James C. Peters, Ernest D. Del, Peter J. Goetner. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2019 09:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Pretrial Conference set fo r 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Selection set for 3/16/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 - 3/24/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 31, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER: Defendant's answer to Complaint extended to 5/19/2017; Defendant's responsive motions for hearing due 7/25/2017; plaintiff's opposition due 6/16/2017; defendant's r eplies due 7/7/2017. Case Management Conference continued from 5/23/2017 to 7/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due 7/18/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/5/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) Modified on 4/5/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdo et al v. Fitzsimmons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Abdo
Represented By: Jason P. Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Eugene Ernest Stearns
Represented By: Max Baba Twine
Represented By: Jason P. Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Eugene Ernest Stearns
Represented By: Max Baba Twine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher G. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Goetner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Borcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest D. Del
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc S. Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Souheil S. Badran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Rising Tide I, LLC
Represented By: Rees Ferriter Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Rising Tide II, LLC
Represented By: Rees Ferriter Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?