Palega v. The Property Sciences Group, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Candida Palega
Defendant: The Property Sciences Group, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2017cv00855
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED by Judge William Alsup granting 44 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Continuance of Deadline for Motion for Class Certification filed by The Property Sciences Group, Incorporated Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 29, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 42 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
May 19, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 9, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palega v. The Property Sciences Group, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Palega
Represented By: Don J. Foty
Represented By: William Marshall Hogg
Represented By: Galvin B. Kennedy
Represented By: Lorrie T. Peeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Property Sciences Group, Incorporated
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?