Schubert v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al

Plaintiff: James W Schubert
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00856
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Dismissing Case with Prejudice; Denying 49 Ex Parte Application as Moot. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 14, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Request to Amend Dismissal Order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/14/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schubert v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Alison Valerie Lippa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Alison Valerie Lippa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Schubert
Represented By: Daniel Alan Grout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?