Martinez v. Stellar Recovery, Inc.,

Plaintiff: Liliana Martinez
Defendant: Stellar Recovery, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2017cv00865
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting dismissal of the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/16/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 8, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 for Extension of Time to Finalize Settlement and Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/1/2017 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
March 28, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Standby Order of Dismissal. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/18/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Stellar Recovery, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Martinez
Represented By: Jonathan A Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Recovery, Inc.,
Represented By: Adam Brooke Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?