Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc.
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Port Commission, Elaine Forbes, Peter Daley, Jeff Bauer and Joe Monroe
Case Number: 3:2017cv00904
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 79 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/16/2019 filed by Peter Daley, Elaine Forbes, Joe Monroe, Jeff Bauer, City and County of San Francisco, San Franci sco Port Commission. Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 50 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Peter Daley, Elaine Forbes, Joe Monroe, Jeff Bauer, City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Port Commission Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Initial Disclosures and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to June 15, 2017 filed by Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss to Continue Hearing Date and Briefing Deadlines filed by Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc.
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Port Commission
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Forbes
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Daley
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bauer
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Monroe
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?