Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund, Stop Animal Exploitation Now, Companion Animal Protection Society and Animal Folks
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Case Number: 3:2017cv00949
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 STIPULATION - Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 14, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. 35 Administrative Motion to File Surreply granted. Plaintiffs will have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 1, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 9/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 17, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 STIPULATION continuing deadlines re 26 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 6/21/2017. Reply due by 7/19/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
April 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 STIPULATION to reset deadlines re 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 4/26/2017. Reply due by 5/3/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/05/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Margaret Benvignati Kwoka
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stop Animal Exploitation Now
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Margaret Benvignati Kwoka
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Animal Protection Society
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Margaret Benvignati Kwoka
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Folks
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Margaret Benvignati Kwoka
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Peter Michael Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Peter Michael Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?