Wyche v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Beverly Wyche
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01058
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation Re: Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 6, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation Requesting to Extend Time to File an Answer to First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 17, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
May 25, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyche v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Wyche
Represented By: Ashwin Virji Ladva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Clement Cheng
Represented By: Zachary W Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?