Burgess v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charles Burgess
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01060
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines Pending Consolidation [N.D. Cal. L.R. 6-2] filed by Charles Burgess. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 11, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Charles Burgess filed by Charles Burgess. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
March 17, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. to Answer filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Burgess
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Christian Andolina
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia M. Kiser
Represented By: Eric Blaine Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?