Regalado v. City of Salinas et al

Plaintiff: Jose Regalado
Defendant: City of Salinas, Carlo Calupad, Cameron Murphy and Stephen Craig
Case Number: 3:2017cv01068
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017) Modified on 7/6/2017 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TRANSFER ACTION TO SAN JOSE DIVISION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 28, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Change Venue signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/17: This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regalado v. City of Salinas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Regalado
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlo Calupad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?